THE ASHBOURNE AND DISTRICT SWIMMING POOL AND COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Swimming
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 20 February 1968: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DERBYSHIRE DALES DISTRICT COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 458 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 823 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1188 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1553 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2O JANUARY 1968 AND SCHEME OF THE 14 MARCH 1974
Charitable objects
"PROVIDING EQUIPPING, MAINTAINING AND MANAGING A SWIMMING BATH, TOGETHER WITH THE BUILDINGS APPROPRIATE THERETO, FOR THE EDUCATION AND RECREATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE TOWN OF ASHBOURNE AND OF THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT IN THE COUNTY OF DERBY AND SUBJECT THERETO FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE BENEFICIAL TO SUCH INHABITANTS AS ARE OF AN EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE NATURE"
Area of benefit
ASHBOURNE AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
DERBYSHIRE DALES DISTRICT COUNCIL
TOWN HALL
BANK ROAD
MATLOCK
DE4 3NN
- Phone:
- 01629761100
- Email:
- legal@derbyshiredales.gov.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window