Financial history BUXTON UNIT 497 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 520426
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £31.27k £10.80k £17.28k £11.80k £22.66k
Total expenditure £34.40k £16.58k £10.80k £12.00k £9.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £21.39k