Accounts and annual returns THE CHESTERFIELD MINERS' WELFARE FUND SOCIETY

Charity number: 520431
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 08 July 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 March 2020 151 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required