LANGLEY MILL MINERS' WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 520468
Charity reporting is overdue by 810 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 79 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 445 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 445 days
Annual return 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 810 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Overdue Overdue by 810 days
Annual return 31 March 2017 12 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 26 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required