MAREHAY MINERS' WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 520478
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 December 2020 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 December 2020 54 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 November 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 November 2019 4 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 August 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 19 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 19 September 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 22 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 15 September 2016 On time Download