MAREHAY MINERS' WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 520478
Charity reporting is up to date (54 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £120.57k £126.92k £106.74k £114.96k £108.03k
Total expenditure £115.64k £119.90k £115.92k £113.81k £112.10k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A