Financial history DUCKMANTON MINERS WELFARE CENTRE

Charity number: 520479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £13.44k £12.33k £1.25k £4.62k £21.42k
Total expenditure £19.91k £16.79k £15.49k £11.35k £14.15k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £200 £200 N/A N/A £16.34k