PERSEVER PRODUCTIONS CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, maintain, improve and advance the publics education in and appreciation of, the arts. Providing mentoring and training to artists to enable them to produce public works of a higher standard, thus benefitting the publics understanding and experience of live theatre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 November 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Doyle | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Arnold | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy-Claire Duckworth | Trustee | 23 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Sarah Kirke | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Southey Coombes | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Louise Barker | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 October 2024 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 October 2024 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PERFORMING ARTS OF THEATRE AND MUSIC, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC PERFORMANCES, AND BY PROVIDING TRAINING AND WORKSHOPS TO ARTISTS TO ENABLE THEM TO PRODUCE WORKS OF A HIGHER STANDARD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Post Office Cottage
The Ridings
Leafield
Oxfordshire
OX29 9NN
- Phone:
- 07976321673
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window