Accounts and annual returns PINXTON MINERS WELFARE INSTITUTE AND RECREATION GROUND

Charity number: 520496
Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 206 days
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 Overdue Overdue by 206 days
Annual return 31 January 2022 30 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 08 December 2020 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required