Accounts and annual returns SHIRLAND MINERS WELFARE

Charity number: 520507
Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 328 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 328 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 February 2023 485 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 February 2023 485 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 December 2020 54 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 December 2020 54 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 19 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 19 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 26 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 26 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window