Financial history SHIRLAND MINERS WELFARE

Charity number: 520507
Charity reporting is overdue by 334 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £166.33k £201.11k £200.97k £183.77k £103.02k
Total expenditure £192.76k £171.27k £213.83k £214.76k £102.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £38.27k