HOLBROOK MINERS' WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 520550
Charity reporting is overdue by 1548 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 87 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 87 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 452 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 452 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 818 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 818 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1183 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1183 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1548 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1548 days