Financial history HOLBROOK MINERS' WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 520550
Charity reporting is overdue by 1670 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £75.69k £63.39k £48.86k £45.31k £49.90k
Total expenditure £43.90k £64.12k £49.58k £45.95k £49.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0