COMMUNITY TRANSFORMATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Warm welcome to all visitors. We offer recreational & leisure time activities; Advice & support where possible; Laptops & WiFi access; Education/training support eg. Computers for Beginners; Standing Tall Support helping to make positive changes; Youth & toddler activities; Local partners eg. Councillors, Social prescribers, Tenancy officers & their clients; Support local foodbank & summer gala.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 03 February 2023: CIO registration
- 10 August 2023: Funds received from 1149268 COMMUNITY TRANSFORMATION
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC NICHOLAS | Chair | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
VERA NICHOLAS | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Jane Bentley | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
GEORGE BENTLEY | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.43k | £506 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.88k | £5.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £810 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 15 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 06 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF ROTHER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS; AND TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
THE RESIDENTS OF ROTHER AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
20 Harvest Way
Ashgate
Chesterfield
S42 7JX
- Phone:
- 07368111346
- Website:
-
umbrellascosyhub.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window