PACKED LUNCH PRODUCTIONS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We specialise in inclusive community-level programming in moving-image, fine art and performance-based practices, designing and delivering learning programmes to nurture skills and increase public involvement in visual narratives, producing experiences for diverse audiences and participants, providing platforms to both grow and showcase skills and fostering creative communication.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 January 2024: Standard registration
- PACKED LUNCH (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Hewson | Chair | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Jane Robert | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Marie Charles | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07 JUL 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE ARTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH VISUAL STORYTELLING BY A. PROMOTING HIGH STANDARDS AND DIVERSE ENGAGEMENT IN THE AREAS OF FINE ART, MOVING IMAGE AND PERFORMANCE; B. DELIVERING PROGRAMMES FOR THE PUBLIC IN THESE AREAS; C. PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES AND CREATIVE PLATFORMS TO DEVELOP SKILLS AND SHOWCASE WORK IN THESE AREAS; AND D. SUCH OTHER WHOLLY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE IN RELATION TO THESE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Cooper's Yard
London
SE19 1TN
- Phone:
- 07790115786
- Email:
- hello@packedlunch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.