REIVERS DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 520605
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

As part of the Scout Association, to promote the development of young people in achieving their full physical, intellectual, social and spiritual potential through a scheme of enjoyable and progressive training. The Council owns and manages the Scout campsite at Ratlingate, Kirkandrews-on-eden, Carlisle.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £63,808
Total expenditure: £52,927

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CARLISLE AND DISTRICT BOY SCOUTS LOCAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
  • CUMBRIA NORTH AND EAST DIVISIONAL SCOUT COUNCIL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Edward Humes Trustee 05 September 2023
None on record
Chloe Megan McHattie Trustee 02 July 2020
None on record
MARION PROUDFOOT Trustee 06 July 2018
NORTH CUMBRIA METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
MIRIAM CRAWLEY Trustee 06 July 2018
None on record
Ian Lewis Astle Trustee 03 March 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.61k £154.20k £25.15k £52.90k £63.81k
Total expenditure £24.35k £28.76k £27.59k £41.85k £52.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.67k £10.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 24 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 24 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 19 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 21 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Scout Camp
Ratlingate
Kirkandrews-On-Eden
CARLISLE
CA5 6DW
Phone:
07464016633