CUMBRIA COUNTY SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 520617
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Thomas John Norton Chair 22 September 2020 None on record
Joshua Harry Musgrave Trustee 21 September 2021 None on record
Nichola Susan Ripley Trustee 21 September 2021 None on record
Liam Mark Edgley Trustee 17 September 2019 None on record
JOHN HOWARD SEED Trustee 19 May 2019
BRYAN BECK ESTATE Overdue by 26 days
Peter Nicol Trustee 18 September 2018 None on record
Arthur Geraint Lester Trustee 21 September 2021 None on record
Joshua McLeod Trustee 18 September 2018
1ST KENDAL SCOUT GROUP Received: On time
Edward James Ward Trustee 17 November 2016 None on record
MR TIM LEADER Trustee None on record
Gavin Jamie Scott Trustee 21 September 2021 None on record
ALAN CLARK Trustee 19 September 2017
LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF WORKINGTON INFIRMARY Received: On time
NORTH FELLS DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL Received: On time