CHESTERFIELD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 520651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 September 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 17 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 17 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 07 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 September 2017 On time Download