CHESTERFIELD DISTRICT SCOUT COUNCIL

Charity number: 520651
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £62.96k £57.60k £57.68k £61.75k £49.99k
Total expenditure £64.83k £52.93k £57.60k £53.63k £22.26k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £300 £0 N/A N/A N/A