TRAVEL HANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Travel Hands charity relieves the needs of Visually Impaired People (VIP) by facilitating safe, convenient, and inexpensive outdoor travel so they can attend formal appointments, recreational activities and community events. Travel Hands eases the outdoor commute of VIP by pairing them with sighted & verified volunteers to walk together to similar destinations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 06 January 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ishan Jha | Chair | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Piyush Chaudhary | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marco Fabbri | Trustee | 06 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH VISUAL IMPAIRMENTS BY FACILITATING SAFE, CONVENIENT, AND INEXPENSIVE OUTDOOR TRAVEL SO THEY CAN ATTEND FORMAL APPOINTMENTS, RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND COMMUNITY EVENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 35
Goldcrest House
32-64 Lee High Road
LONDON
SE13 5FH
- Phone:
- +442039661650
- Email:
- ishan@vipworldservices.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window