10TH MATLOCK (1ST WIRKSWORTH) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 520669
Charity reporting is up to date (8 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennifer Quigley Trustee 26 November 2017 None on record
Elizabeth Abrahams Trustee 27 February 2019 None on record
Alison Foote Chair 07 November 2017 None on record
Elizabeth Ormond Trustee 07 November 2017 None on record
Martin Brown Trustee 03 October 2018 None on record
Andrew Fretter Trustee 23 January 2018 None on record
Andrew Zwolinski Trustee 01 May 2020 None on record
Andrew Pimm Trustee 07 November 2017 None on record
ALEX BUTLER Trustee 26 November 2017 None on record