1ST SOUTH NORMANTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
South Normanton Scouts is part of the worldwide Scout movement. We try and up hold the Scouting motto and help young children understand responsibilities, self respect and respecting others, becoming trusting, self controlled and self confident young people. The Scout Group was founded in 1910 by Mr C Blackhurst and has developed into a strong group, having Beavers, Cubs and Scouts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 14 May 1964: Standard registration
- 1ST SOUTH NORMANTON SCOUTS (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NIGEL NEEDHAM | Chair | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Leivers | Trustee | 22 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR CLEGG TREASURER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.86k | £20.91k | £16.22k | £7.92k | £8.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.59k | £9.37k | £7.95k | £7.72k | £18.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.50k | £9.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF BOYS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY, AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
SOUTH NORMANTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
57 White Ash Road
South Normanton
ALFRETON
Derbyshire
DE55 3BF
- Phone:
- 07956813128
- Email:
- alistair.c72@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window