2ND PETERLEE (ST CUTHBERT'S) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 520702
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £8.48k £7.01k £4.90k £5.97k £5.58k
Total expenditure £9.44k £6.66k £4.76k £5.25k £7.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A