INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR FIRE SAFETY SCIENCE

Charity number: 1202005
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The IAFSS encourages research into, and the application of, science and engineering to prevent and mitigate the adverse effects of fires and provides a forum for sharing and disseminating this knowledge. IAFSS offers valuable resources to members, including free access to our official journal, Fire Safety Journal, and to past symposium proceedings.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £1,000
Total expenditure: £5

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Australia
  • Austria
  • Belgium
  • Brazil
  • Canada
  • Chile
  • China
  • Croatia
  • Cyprus
  • Czech Republic
  • Denmark
  • Ecuador
  • Finland
  • France
  • Germany
  • Hong Kong
  • Iceland
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Ireland
  • Italy
  • Japan
  • Luxembourg
  • Malaysia
  • Mexico
  • Netherlands
  • New Zealand
  • Norway
  • Oman
  • Paraguay
  • Poland
  • Portugal
  • Romania
  • Russia
  • Serbia
  • Slovakia
  • Slovenia
  • South Africa
  • South Korea
  • Spain
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland
  • Taiwan
  • Ukraine
  • United Arab Emirates
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 February 2023: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • IAFSS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Naian Liu Chair 30 November 2023
None on record
Professor Yuji Nakamura Trustee 30 November 2023
None on record
Professor Arnaud Trouve Trustee 30 November 2023
None on record
Professor Anthony Abu Trustee 30 November 2023
None on record
Professor Xiao Ling Wen Trustee 30 November 2023
THE UNITED KINGDOM EXPLOSION LIAISON GROUP
Received: On time
THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR FIRE SAFETY SCIENCE
Received: On time
Dr Albert Simeoni Trustee 30 November 2023
THE INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR FIRE SAFETY SCIENCE
Received: On time
Dr Eric Camille Marcel Guillaume Trustee 30 November 2023
None on record
Dr Maria de las Nieves Fernandez Anez Trustee 30 November 2023
None on record
Professor Elizabeth Joan Weckman Trustee 20 February 2023
None on record
Dr Brian Meacham Trustee 20 February 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.00k
Total expenditure £5
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 Wonford Close
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
Surrey
KT2 7XA
Phone:
02089423855