Accounts and annual returns GILESGATE COMMUNITY AND WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 520770
Charity reporting is overdue by 1072 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 341 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 341 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 706 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 706 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1072 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1072 days
Annual return 31 December 2017 27 September 2019 331 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 September 2019 331 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 31 May 2017 On time Download Open in new window