Financial history GILESGATE COMMUNITY AND WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 520770
Charity reporting is overdue by 1062 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017
Total gross income £55.12k £50.40k £60.01k £67.15k £68.22k
Total expenditure £52.72k £45.10k £56.52k £62.84k £69.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0