Trustees MENSTRUAL HEALTH PROJECT

Charity number: 1202034
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kate George Chair 15 June 2022
None on record
Dr Rebeccah Tomlinson Trustee 24 October 2024
None on record
Dr Anthony Griffiths Trustee 16 January 2024
None on record
Dr Angela Sharma Trustee 09 September 2023
None on record
Rebecca Donaldson Trustee 09 September 2023
None on record
Amer Raza Trustee 27 July 2023
None on record
Holly Hostettler-Davies Trustee 15 June 2022
None on record