Financial history RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE INSTITUTE

Charity number: 520824
Charity reporting is overdue by 35 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.05k £1.07k £1.10k £1.09k £1.11k
Total expenditure £680 £838 £702 £870 £1.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A