HUNSTANWORTH VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 520828
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.37k £6.11k £726 £8.17k £19.71k
Total expenditure £2.12k £9.02k £1.35k £8.71k £20.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A