LANCHESTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities for hire by organisations & individuals in Lanchester and the surrounding areas. To provide exercise facilities. To organise events to raise funds to assist with the running of the organisation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Durham
Governance
- 04 January 1968: Standard registration
- 22 July 2020: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 22 July 2020: Funds transferred to 1188911 LANCHESTER COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- LANCHESTER AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.14k | £53.60k | £63.98k | £61.36k | £60.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.53k | £51.17k | £61.26k | £59.95k | £60.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.90k | £400 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 21 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 21 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 30 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 30 October 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 31 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 31 October 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30TH OCTOBER 1967 AS AMENDED 21 JULY 1999 AND 21 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
(1) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LANCHESTER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD (2) ESTABLISH A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND MAINTAIN AND MANAGE SAME (3) PROMOTE OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Area of benefit
LANCHESTER AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window