NATIONAL BACK EXCHANGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects are the advancement of health for the public benefit in all aspects of moving and handling and musculoskeletal health. To develop and promote standards for moving and handling of people and loads across all sectors in line with evolving research evidence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

14 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 March 2023: CIO registration
- NBE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Fletcher | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Naylor | Trustee | 17 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Baines | Trustee | 17 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Barker | Trustee | 17 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Collins | Trustee | 17 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Featherby-Davis | Trustee | 17 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Thornton | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY DENIS WALKER | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Cynthia Phillips | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alison Roper | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kerry Kemp | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Furness | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Anne Muir | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Rachel Hoyles | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £173.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 29 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD MUSCLULOSKELETAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING SUCH SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE FOR ALL PEOPLE ACROSS THE HEALTH, SOCIAL CARE, EDUCATIONAL SYSTEMS AND PRIVATE INDUSTRY WHO ARE CONCERNED WITH THE MOVING AND HANDLING OF PEOPLE AND LOADS IN ORDER TO PROTECT THEIR MUSCULOSKELETAL HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROMOTING GOOD PRACTICE IN THE MOVING AND HANDLING OF PEOPLE AND LOADS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 14 THE STOTTIE SHED
BAKERS YARD
CHRISTON ROAD
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
TYNE AND WEAR
NE3 1XD
- Phone:
- 01912442839
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window