Accounts and annual returns Hartlepool Sea Cadets

Charity number: 520906
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required