Accounts and annual returns WINGATE AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 520912
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 July 2022 On time
Annual return 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 January 2022 On time
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 September 2021 218 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 06 September 2021 218 days late
Annual return 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 07 January 2020 On time