BODENHAM PARISH HALL

Charity number: 520936
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £14.01k £12.33k £10.58k £10.04k £19.03k
Total expenditure £7.37k £13.45k £11.38k £23.52k £11.27k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £100 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.20k £0 £0 £1.23k £10.00k