THE GENERAL MICHAEL ARNAOUTIS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PROVISION OF POSTGRADUATE SCHOLARSHIPS IN THE FIELDS OF ELECTRICAL AND COMPUTER ENGINEERING, BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING, INFORMATICS AND ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 January 2023: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nathene Arnaoutis | Chair | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandros Dafkos | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stylianos Moschoglou | Trustee | 19 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 19 DEC 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (?THE OBJECTS?) ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 3.1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF POSTGRADUATE SCHOLARSHIPS IN THE FIELDS OF: 3.1.1. ELECTRICAL AND COMPUTER ENGINEERING; 3.1.2. BIOMEDICAL ENGINEERING; 3.1.3. INFORMATICS; AND 3.1.4. ARTIFICIAL INTELLIGENCE; AND 3.2. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 REDINGTON ROAD
LONDON
NW3 7QX
- Phone:
- 02074354255
- Email:
- nathene@nathenelawyer.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window