WHOLESOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold cooking workshops for those who want to learn about energy efficient appliances and how to cook meals from a store cupboard, fridge and freezer. We hold family days during school holidays, organising activities and providing a two course meal. We do food support to those families struggling with the cost of living We run a Winter Warmth programme We operate in Uttlesford, Essex.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £27,040 from 8 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 20 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeanette Huizar | Chair | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Myers | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Wojciech Bien | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ewa Bien | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
June Crow | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Till | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donna Antoniou | Trustee | 20 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO RELIEVE POVERTY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING ADVICE, PRACTICAL HELP AND FUNDS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR FOOD, FUEL, GENERAL HOUSEHOLD ITEMS AND RECREATIONAL/SOCIAL OUTINGS WHICH THEY WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE ABLE TO AFFORD. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 St Edmunds Fields
GREAT DUNMOW
ESSEX
72 St Edmunds Fields
CM6 2AN
- Phone:
- 07933623762
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window