Financial history TAMESIDE UNIT 13 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 521009
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £49.11k £65.83k £37.42k £26.67k £25.56k
Total expenditure £46.40k £47.89k £31.44k £30.62k £8.36k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A £10.00k