TUDDENHAM ST MARY VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We manage Tuddenham St Mary Village Hall in Suffolk. We promote the use of our hall for community based activities aiming to provide facilities for all local residents by way of meetings, community groups, leisure and recreational facilities. Examples of our regular events are a Youth Club, Cookery Club, Coffee Mornings, Craft & Chatter and a Gardening club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 27 February 2023: CIO registration
- 17 June 2024: Funds received from 304949 TUDDENHAM VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Norman | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Gray | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Davidson | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sara Freeman | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Colchester | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gill Ford | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Ball | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pam Beith | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Murray | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Dudley | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £83.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 27 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF PARISH OF TUDDENHAM ST MARY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: ? MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND ? OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Tuddenham St. Mary Village Hall
School Close
Tuddenham
BURY ST. EDMUNDS
Suffolk
IP28 6FB
- Phone:
- 07365385885
- Email:
- info.tuddenhamvh@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window