Accounts and annual returns BLACKBURN CATHOLIC YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 521023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2021 29 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 29 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 30 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 31 July 2018 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required