Financial history BLACKBURN CATHOLIC YOUTH CENTRE

Charity number: 521023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £8.74k £8.54k £6.84k £15.68k £4.37k
Total expenditure £12.72k £12.57k £10.70k £7.39k £9.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £10.00k N/A