BURNLEY, PENDLE AND ROSSENDALE UNIT 59 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS

Charity number: 521056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aim of the Unit is to provide a range of activities and adventures within a caring and disciplined environment based on the standards of the Royal Navy, to which young people can respond, and which in turn will assist in their development of self confidence, self discipline, leadership and a sense of responsibility to the community.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £14,912
Total expenditure: £17,673

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 August 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • T.S. LOOKOUT (Working name)
  • SEA CADET CORPS BURNLEY PENDLE ROSSENDALE UNIT NO 59 (Previous name)
  • SEA CADET CORPS BURNLEY UNIT NO 59 (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Richardson Chair 04 November 2022
None on record
Jane Mckellar Trustee 04 October 2024
None on record
Christopher Shaw Trustee 31 October 2023
None on record
Mark Pollard Trustee 04 November 2022
None on record
GRAHAM BALDERSON Trustee
None on record
ELIZABETH CLARE JUBB Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £10.71k £16.60k £18.10k £12.64k £14.91k
Total expenditure £8.63k £8.62k £18.11k £20.34k £17.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £10.10k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 08 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 August 2021 212 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
7 Chipping Grove
BURNLEY
Lancashire
BB10 4PA
Phone:
01282604297