Accounts and annual returns SALFORD SEA CADETS (T S ILEX)

Charity number: 521094
Charity reporting is up to date (178 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 July 2022 178 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 14 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 08 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required