FRIENDS OF DOXFORD PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Friends of Doxford Park maintains the park area, ensuring it is in keeping with the conservation area and the Sunderland Council master plan. Volunteers clear litter as well as plant and clear flora and fauna when required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £32,117 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sunderland
Governance
- 20 January 2023: CIO registration
- 04 October 2023: Funds received from 1199559 FRIENDS OF DOXFORD PARK
- FODP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Makins | Chair | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
christine Hamilton | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Charlton | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
neale Brown | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Emma Williamson | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.41k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £32.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE GROUP ARE: TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF DOXFORD PARK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Doxford Park Lodge
Silksworth Road
Sunderland
sr3 2pe
- Phone:
- 01915225811
- Website:
-
www,friendsofdoxfordpark.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window