CLOUD NINE MUSICAL THEATRE GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO CREATE, TEACH, ENCOURAGE AND DELIVER MUSICAL AND PERFORMANCE OPPORTUNITIES TO ADULTS OF ALL AGES IN OUR COMMUNITY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- West Sussex
Governance
- 19 January 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steven Harley Newman | Chair | 02 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Skelton | Trustee | 19 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Roland Robinson | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Graves | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Graves | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Jane Townsend | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Townsend | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Tania Butler-Townsend | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jan 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO PROMOTE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF THE ART OF MUSICAL THEATRE (SINGING, DANCING AND ACTING) AND TECHNICAL SHOW PRODUCTION, INCLUDING SOUND AND LIGHTING, STAGE MANAGEMENT AND BACKSTAGE ACTIVITIES AND TO STAGE A VARIETY OF THEATRICAL WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 Robinson Close
Selsey
Chichester
PO20 0FD
- Phone:
- 01243601470
- Email:
- cloud9selsey@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window