ICAN WELLBEING GROUP CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
iCan is a health, wellbeing and social support charitable organisation. Officially registered as a charity in June 2023, after 6 years previously operating as a CIC and over 10 year prior to that in the private sector. Our mission is to break down activity and mental wellbeing barriers from I can't to iCan with a focus on prevention before recovery.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £14,446 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cumbria
Governance
- 28 June 2023: CIO registration
- ICAN HEALTH & FITNESS CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Helena Jane Jonsson | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Yvonne Caldwell | Trustee | 12 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Clifford | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Westgate | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neil Alexander Ford | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £282.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £358.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (1) PROVIDING COMMUNITY HEALTH SERVICES INCLUDING A WELLBEING CENTRE AND A MOBILE FITNESS ENGAGEMENT FACILITY; (2) UNDERTAKING RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, DIAGNOSIS, TREATMENT AND MANAGEMENT OF INACTIVITY THAT LEADS TO ILLNESS AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; (3) PROVIDING SERVICES FOR THE EARLY IDENTIFICATION OF CONDITIONS THAT MAY LEAD TO LIFESTYLE DISEASES, SUCH AS OBESITY AND TYPE 2 DIABETES; (4) PROVIDING ADVICE ON NUTRITION AND EXERCISE FOR PEOPLE WHO SUFFER FROM, OR WHO ARE AT RISK OF SUFFERING FROM A LIFESTYLE DISEASE; (5) REFERRING PEOPLE WHO ARE SUFFERING FROM LIFESTYLE DISEASES TO APPROPRIATE MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS FOR TREATMENT, IF NECESSARY, THROUGH SOCIAL LINK WORKERS AND APPROPRIATE PATHWAYS; AND (6) PROVIDING FREE HEALTH CHECKS TO PEOPLE WHO ARE UNABLE TO AFFORD IT THROUGH LACK OF MEANS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 17 & 18 The Malting
Bridge Street
Carlisle
Cumbria
CA2 5SR
- Phone:
- 01228819101
- Email:
- Julia@icanwellbeing.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window