UNIVERSITY OF MANCHESTER INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY

Charity number: 521248
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 25 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 25 May 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 04 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 04 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 23 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

23 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 23 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 23 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 18 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 18 May 2017 On time Download