PLATEFUL CAFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Plateful Cafe empowers refugees to obtain mainstream employment in the catering industry by providing hospitality training and employment in a cafe.The cafe also runs a shop selling products made by local refugees and delivers monthly community dinners.Plateful Cafe also caters for outside events and offers private dining in people homes.Asylum-seekers volunteer at the cafe.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
64 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bromley
- Greenwich
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 13 April 2023: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
yasmin Al Hamadi | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Enxhi Lami | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
waeed almbasbes | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 03 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 13 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1. TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND GRANTED ASYLUM AND THEIR DEPENDENTS IN SOUTH EAST LONDON AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL SKILLS TRAINING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO ENABLE SUCH PEOPLE TO OBTAIN EMPLOYMENT; 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS, THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN GRANTED ASYLUM AND THOSE WHO ARE SEEKING ASYLUM IN SOUTH EAST LONDON AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND HELP THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY; 3. TO EDUCATE THE GENERAL PUBLIC OF THE RIGHTS AND NEEDS OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS; AND 4. THE PROMOTION OF SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AMONG PEOPLE WHO ARE REFUGEES, THEIR DEPENDENTS OR SEEKING ASYLUM IN SOUTH EAST LONDON AND NEIGHBOURING BOROUGHS, AND WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED ON THE GROUNDS OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC POSITION BY OFFERING ACTIVITIES, TRAINING AND SUPPORT DIRECTED TO ENABLING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Honley Road
Catford
Lewisham
London
SE6 2HZ
- Phone:
- 07984239912
- Email:
- iolanda@platefulcafe.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window