Financial history RECREATION GROUND-WALTON-LE-DALE

Charity number: 521341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £34.21k £19.22k £22.56k £28.31k £46.22k
Total expenditure £30.03k £22.27k £15.93k £29.00k £57.64k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A