CATHEDRAL CHURCH OF ST THOMAS OF CANTERBURY PORTSMOUTH

Charity number: 1207410
Recently registered

Charity overview

This charity has been recently registered - it does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects are (a) to advance the Christian religion in accordance with the faith and practice of the Church of England, in particular by furthering the mission of the Church of England; (b) to care for and conserve the fabric and structure of the Cathedral Church building; (c) to advance any other charitable purposes which are ancillary to the furtherance of the above purposes

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire
  • Isle Of Wight
  • Portsmouth City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 March 2024: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PORTSMOUTH CATHEDRAL (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Very Reverend Dr Anthony William Nicholas Strephon Cane Chair 19 March 2019
None on record
Pippa Tangye Eleanor Bostock Trustee 21 November 2024
None on record
Santosh Philip Mathew Trustee 22 September 2024
None on record
MARK SIMON EMERTON Trustee 22 September 2024
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FARLINGTON, PORTSMOUTH
Received: On time
VETERANS OUTREACH SUPPORT
Received: On time
David William King Trustee 22 September 2024
AMERSHAM UNITED CHARITIES
Received: On time
AMERSHAM UNITED CHARITIES CIO
Recently registered
THE REVD CANON HARRIET ANNA NEALE-STEVENS Trustee 17 September 2023
None on record
RONALD BARTON RABBETTS Trustee 24 May 2022
None on record
ALEXANDRE EDMOND ROSS LOCHRANE Trustee 24 May 2022
None on record
Canon Dr Joanna Mary Magdalen Spreadbury Trustee 15 September 2015
THE OUSELEY CHURCH MUSIC TRUST
Received: On time
The Revd Canon Nicholas Robert Ralph Trustee 22 November 2009
None on record

Financial history

This charity was registered recently. It does not have to provide information until 10 months after its first financial period.

Accounts and annual returns

This is a newly registered charity - accounts and annual return not required yet. The charity does not need to update its information until 10 months after its first financial period ends.

Governing document

Contact information

Address:
CATHEDRAL OFFICES
63-68 ST THOMAS'S STREET
PO1 2HA
Phone:
02392823300