OASIS HOUSE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer weekly Bible study, services, English courses for ESL learners, scholarships for theology studies, and supports missions in Africa.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 19 July 2023: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pastor Fabio Eduardo | Chair | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Rocha Eduardo | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Ivan Pozzi Eduardo | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Rodrigo Bortolani | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH (OBJECTS) ARE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, TO: (A) ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, AS AN EVANGELICAL CHURCH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION, THROUGH PUBLIC RELIGIOUS WORSHIP, PREACHING THE GOSPEL OF CHRIST, THE TEACHING OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN, AND THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE, SUPPORT AND COUNSELLING; AND (B) ADVANCE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH BY PUTTING INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH, INCLUDING, WITHOUT LIMITATION: (I) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; (II) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND (III) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN EACH CASE IN GOOLE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, THROUGHOUT THE UK AND ACROSS THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oasis House Church
44-50 Carter Street
GOOLE
DN14 6SN
- Phone:
- 07850976433
- Email:
- oasishousechurch@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window